MEEHAN SHEA MR |
5/20/2008 |
250 |
P |
Bruce Spanner | 2008 Funding Details
Bruce Spanner
|
Benton & Franklin Superior Court
Position One
Public Disclosure Commission
Detailed Contribution Data
as of July 29, 2008
|
Cash*: |
$38,071.63 |
In-Kind: |
$3,008.73 |
Expenditures: |
$29,354.87 |
Ind For: |
$0.00 |
Ind Against: |
$0.00 |
Anonymous: |
$0.00 |
Personal Funds: |
$4,700.00 |
Loans: |
$4,700.00 |
Misc: |
$10.00 |
Small Contr: |
$585.00 |
Name |
Date |
Amount |
P/G |
City |
State |
Zip |
Employer |
Occupation |
RINGERS INCORPORATED |
7/15/2008 |
1600 |
P |
W. RICHLAND |
WA |
99353 |
|
|
ROGERS ERIC R |
6/13/2008 |
1600 |
P |
MOUNT VERNON |
WA |
98273 |
SELF EMPLOYED |
FARMER |
BANNWORTH STEVE |
6/3/2008 |
1000 |
P |
KENNEWICK |
WA |
99337 |
LAMB WESTON CONAGRA |
VP SALES |
DENNETT WILLIAM F MR |
5/15/2008 |
750 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
CHOICES AND CHANGES |
EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR |
ASTLEY EUGENE R MR |
5/4/2008 |
500 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99354 |
|
RETIRED |
ASTLEY PEGGY |
5/4/2008 |
500 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99354 |
|
RETIRED |
BRODZINSKI JO |
6/24/2008 |
500 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
SELF EMPLOYED |
WINERY OWNER |
CZEBOTAR TONY MR |
5/27/2008 |
500 |
P |
WARDEN |
WA |
98857 |
CZEBOTAR FARMS |
OWNER |
ENGELHARD NORM MR |
5/20/2008 |
500 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
SELF |
SELF EMPLOYED |
FISCHER DAVID W |
7/9/2008 |
500 |
P |
KENNEWICK |
WA |
99336 |
SELF |
PHYSICIAN |
HEAP ADRIAN |
7/15/2008 |
500 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
SELF |
PHYSICIAN |
PARRISH VIC MR |
7/15/2008 |
500 |
P |
WEST RICHLAND |
WA |
99353 |
ENERGY NORTHWEST |
CEO |
WEIGHALL STEVEN |
7/8/2008 |
500 |
P |
KENNEWICK |
WA |
99338 |
KADLEC HOSPITAL |
PHYSICIAN |
SUNRISE FARMS |
6/2/2008 |
400 |
P |
PASCO |
WA |
99301 |
|
|
BLANKENSHIP TERRY |
6/3/2008 |
250 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
SELF |
DEVELOPER |
CADWELL CARLTON |
7/15/2008 |
250 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
CADWELL LABORATORIES |
OWNER |
CADWELL LYNDA |
7/15/2008 |
250 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
|
HOMEMAKER |
CAMERON TODD |
7/15/2008 |
250 |
P |
ELTOPIA |
WA |
99330 |
SELF |
FARMER |
DEGAN ROBERT |
7/1/2008 |
250 |
P |
KENNEWICK |
WA |
99338 |
SELF |
TAX PREPARATION & SERVICE |
HANSEN JANICE M |
6/2/2008 |
250 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
|
RETIRED |
HANSEN SCOT T MR |
6/2/2008 |
250 |
P |
RICHLAND |
WA |
99352 |
HANSEN & NEIFFER |
CPA |
HERRIG JOHN R MR |
5/24/2008 |
250 |
P |
PASCO |
WA |
99301 |
HERRIG AND VOGT, LLP |
ATTORNEY |
HERRIG MARSHA S |
5/24/2008 |
250 |
P |
PASCO |
WA |
99301 |
|
HOMEMAKER |
HOPP ROBERT MR |
5/20/2008 |
250 |
P |
KENNEWICK |
WA |
99336 |
AG WORLD SUPPORT SYSTEMS |
DISTRICT MANAGER |
HUE RONALD MR |
5/20/2008 |
250 |
P |
KENNEWICK |
WA |
99337 |
HAPO COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION |
BANKING |
JILEK SPENCER MR |
5/20/2008 |
250 |
P |
PASCO |
WA |
99301 |
JILEK DENTAL |
DENTIST |
LIPPES DAVID |
7/8/2008 |
250 |
P |
KENNEWICK |
WA |
99337 |
TISPORT |
CEO |
MEEHAN SHEA MR |
5/20/2008 |
250 |
P |
| |